+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Pr. Ch. 65
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/15/2014
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
April 15, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 15, 2014: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor