+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 848
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/14/2018
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/6/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.