+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 949
- Effective date(s) 04/29/2022
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 89, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB2537
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/14/22
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 2
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0757)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0582)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/2/2022
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/22/2022
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- Ref. to Health Committee
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 14, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Yeas: 88
April 7, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 21, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
March 21, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 2, 2022: HOUSE HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 22, 2022: HOUSE HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor