+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 80
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/15/2014
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 15, 2014: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor