+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Failed in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee--Criminal Justice
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 16, 2016: INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor