+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 78
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/16/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/15/2014
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93