+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Failed In s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/20/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/20/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/13/2013
- Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/13/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/6/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 20, 2013: CONSUMER AND HUMAN RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 3