+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 917
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/10/2018
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Re-ref. Criminal Justice Committee
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/21/2018
- Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/21/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/14/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/14/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/28/2018
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.