+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Pr. Ch. 47
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/7/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/3/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/1/2014
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
April 3, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 1, 2014: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor