+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/16/2020
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/16/2020
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 2/26/2020
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/18/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction