+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 62
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/5/2013
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/27/2013
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0077
Amendment 1-0 to HB0025
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2013: TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE
February 27, 2013: TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor