+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 900
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/8/2014
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/1/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/11/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/4/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee--Government Operations
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (6)
April 8, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
April 8, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
April 8, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
April 1, 2014: GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE
March 18, 2014: EDUCATION COMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor