+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 961
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/14/2016
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/12/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/29/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/22/2016
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs--Government Operations for review
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.