+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor