+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Failed in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/1/2022
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction