+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 416
- Effective date(s) 05/21/2019
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 1
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 5, PNV 5
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0443)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Action def. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/16/2019
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/9/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Action def. in State Committee to 4/2/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/26/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Action def. in State Committee to 3/26/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/19/2019
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref. to Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Clerk's Desk
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
- Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 2/20/2019
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/13/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 30, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
April 22, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 5
April 22, 2019: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 17, 2019: HOUSE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 2, 2019: HOUSE STATE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 13, 2019: HOUSE DEPARTMENTS & AGENCIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor