+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/20/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor