+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/22/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/15/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/8/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/8/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/1/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor