+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 25, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1034
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2022
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/19/2022
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/19/2022
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2022
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2022
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/6/2022
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2022
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction