+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 801
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/22/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/9/2016
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/2/2016
- Action def. in Health Committee to 3/2/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/24/2016
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/16/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Criminal Justice
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 22, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 16, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 9, 2016: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 2, 2016: HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
February 16, 2016: HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor