+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 758
- Effective date(s) 01/01/2019
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/26/2018
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/13/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (6)
April 2, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 26, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 98
March 13, 2018: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 13, 2018: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 7, 2018: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
March 7, 2018: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor