+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 571
- Effective date(s) 03/21/2014
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 81, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
- Passed S., Ayes 26, Nays 0
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/3/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/25/2014
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 81
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
February 25, 2014: STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor