+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 734
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0792)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0710)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/8/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 23, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 32
March 14, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 14, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 95
March 8, 2016: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 2, 2016: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor