+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 04/20/2022
- Pub. Ch. 847
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 3
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2022
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/15/2022
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/9/2022
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (5)
April 6, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
March 24, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 3
March 24, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 15, 2022: HOUSE STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 9, 2022: HOUSE PUBLIC SERVICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor