+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee--Government Operations for review
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.