+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 769
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2016
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/23/2016
- Action def. in Health Committee to 3/23/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/16/2016
- Action def. in Health Committee to 3/16/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/9/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/1/2016
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/1/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/23/2016
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/23/2016
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/9/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.