+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 972
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2016
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2016
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Criminal Justice Committee
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/30/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/23/2016
- Action def. in Health Committee to 3/23/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/16/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/8/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/1/2016
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Criminal Justice
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 18, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 18, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 30, 2016: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 23, 2016: HEALTH COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Criminal Justice Committee
March 8, 2016: HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor