+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Failed in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/4/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
- Ref. to State Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction