+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 5/27/2020
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/18/2020
- Action Def. in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee to 3/18/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor