+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 901
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- H. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 71, Nays 9 PNV 6 HB2406
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/13/2016
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0956)
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 68, Nays 20, PNV 1
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1080)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0605)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/31/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/22/2016
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
- Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/16/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/9/2016
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/23/2016
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2016
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/17/2016
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/10/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
April 13, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 28
March 31, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 1
March 22, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 16, 2016: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 23, 2016: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 17, 2016: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor