+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 806
- Effective date(s) 04/25/2014
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/10/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/4/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/26/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
March 6, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE
February 26, 2014: LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor