+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 1
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/12/2013
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/5/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2