+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 805
- Effective date(s) 10/01/2014
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
- H. concurred in S. am. no. 1, Ayes 94, Nays 2
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/9/2014
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 24, Nays 4, PNV 1
- S. adopted am. #1
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 66, Nays 25, PNV 1
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/20/2014
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/19/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (6)
April 9, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 2
April 3, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
March 20, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 19, 2014: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
March 12, 2014: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor