+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 719
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2022
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/22/2022
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/15/2022
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 22, 2022: HOUSE LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 15, 2022: HOUSE CITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor