+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 735
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/2/2020
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/26/2020
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/18/2020
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 2/19/2020
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction