+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Held on desk.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018
- Reset on cal. for 4/16/2018
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018
- Reset on next avail. cal.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1060)
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2018
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/27/2018
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
- Roll 2 places
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to State Government Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.