+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 899
- Effective date(s) 04/27/2016
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 1
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1017)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1107)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2016
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2016
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/6/2016
- Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/6/2016
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/30/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2016
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- Sponsor change.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2016
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- P1C.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
April 14, 2016: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 14, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 87