+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
- Pub. Ch. 311
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0063)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0258)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/7/2021
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 22, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 19, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
April 19, 2021: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 7, 2021: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 31, 2021: HOUSE CHILDREN & FAMILY AFFAIRS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor