+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 742
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 6/2/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/17/2020
- Meeeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee cal. for 3/17/20
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/10/2020
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee cal. for 3/10/20
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/3/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/25/2020
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 8, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
June 2, 2020: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 25, 2020: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor