+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 811
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/10/2018
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/27/2018
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
- Move to Heel
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Move to Heel
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
- Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 2/28/2018
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/21/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 12, 2018: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 12, 2018: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 27, 2018: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 27, 2018: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 21, 2018: AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
March 21, 2018: HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor