+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Pub. Ch. 635
- Effective date(s) 04/01/2020
On April 1, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 3
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0648)
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 19, PNV 2
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0563)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/9/2020
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Local Committee for 2/26/2020
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/19/2020
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Local Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 18, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 9, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
March 9, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
February 26, 2020: HOUSE LOCAL COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 19, 2020: HOUSE ELECTIONS & CAMPAIGN FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor