+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 1/29/2020
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Action def. in Judiciary to First Calendar of 2020
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/2/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction