+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Failed for lack of second in: Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Move to Heel
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2018
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor