+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 767
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/2/2022
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 2/23/2022
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 21, 2022: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
March 2, 2022: HOUSE CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
February 23, 2022: HOUSE CHILDREN & FAMILY AFFAIRS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor