+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 04/25/2014
- Pub. Ch. 801
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
- S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rcvd. from H., P1C.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0715)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/6/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2014
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/25/2014
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0715
Amendment 1-0 to HB2350
+ − Votes (4)
April 7, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 32
March 6, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94