+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
- Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/3/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Judiciary
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (3)
G. Johnson
Type:
Primary Sponsor