+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2014
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Education Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor