+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 693
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2014
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/25/2014
- Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/19/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/12/2014
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/4/2014
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
HA0883
Amendment 1-0 to HB2337
+ − Votes (5)
March 27, 2014: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE
March 25, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE
March 19, 2014: FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE
March 12, 2014: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE
March 4, 2014: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor