+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor