+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Failed for Lack of Second in: Business and Utilities Subcommittee
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to heel of last calendar
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/12/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
- P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor